This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 10:50:09 (UTC).

PERLA MAGENO VS DISCOVERY HEALTH SERVICES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 PERLA MAGENO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DISCOVERY HEALTH SERVICES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0448

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGENO PERLA

Defendant

DISCOVERY HEALTH SERVICES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JR JOSEPH RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE COMPLAINT OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTOES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

5/14/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE COMPLAINT OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTOES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (without prejudice complaint of entire action of all partoes and all causes of action); Filed by Perla Mageno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Perla Mageno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Perla Mageno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Perla Mageno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Perla Mageno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less