This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:53:21 (UTC).

PERLA MAGENO VS. ALEXANDER'S STEAKHOUSE, INC. A CA. CORP

Case Summary

On 06/29/2018 PERLA MAGENO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ALEXANDER'S STEAKHOUSE, INC A CA CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8999

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAGENO PERLA AN INDIVIDUAL

MAGENO PERLA

Defendant

ALEXANDER'S STEAKHOUSE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH R. MANNING JR.

MANNING JOSEPH RICHARD JR

Defendant Attorneys

SYBIL L. RENICK

RENICK SYBIL L.

RENICK SYBIL LEE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

12/6/2018: Request for Dismissal

Answer

9/19/2018: Answer

Minute Order

8/30/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/9/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/29/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice

6/29/2018: Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document

6/29/2018: Legacy Document

Summons

6/29/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/29/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

9/19/2018: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by PERLA, MAGENO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by PERLA, MAGENO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ALEXANDER'S STEAKHOUSE, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 am in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by PERLA, MAGENO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketNotice (Of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manning, Jr, Joseph R