Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2020 at 15:30:04 (UTC).

PERLA MAGENO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS. TURNER'S OUTDOORS INC.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 PERLA MAGENO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TURNER'S OUTDOORS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7991

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAGENO PERLA AN INDIVIDUAL

MAGENO PERLA

Defendant

TURNER'S OUTDOORS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH R. MANNING JR.

Defendant Attorney

MICHEL & ASSOCIATES P.C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/5/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons

2/5/2018: Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

2/5/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

2/5/2018: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/5/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request For Copies

2/21/2018: Request For Copies

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

3/6/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Answer

3/23/2018: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-26 00:00:00

4/26/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-26 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

6/27/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-28 00:00:00

6/28/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-28 00:00:00

Request for Dismissal

8/16/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal -

8/16/2018: Request for Dismissal -

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by PERLA, MAGENO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department NCGE, Other District Judge, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by PERLA, MAGENO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketRequest For Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNotice (of OSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less