Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2021 at 01:27:37 (UTC).

PERLA HUDSON VS ELDAV CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 PERLA HUDSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELDAV CONSTRUCTION DEVELOPMENT, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1128

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HUDSON PERLA

ROES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

GJ PLUMBING

B N S MARBLE & GRANITE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

VISION MIRROR AND GLASS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ICON REMOLDING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

ELDAV CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff

ELDAV CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALEY ANDREW J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ZYGELMAN CORINE

KRAUSE-LEEMON DAVID R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

2/19/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/29/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/15/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

11/18/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

11/19/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer

11/12/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/7/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • Hearing06/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by ELDAV CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by PERLA HUDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PERLA HUDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PERLA HUDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ELDAV CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ELDAV CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ELDAV CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PERLA HUDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by ELDAV CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by ELDAV CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ELDAV CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by PERLA HUDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PERLA HUDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PERLA HUDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PERLA HUDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAUSE-LEEMON DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZYGELMAN CORINE