This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 01:32:28 (UTC).

PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC ET AL VS CLUB ACQUISITION

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CLUB ACQUISITION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH R. FEFFER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6764

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Cross Defendants and Respondents

PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC

SERRANO FERNANDO

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY

DOES 1 - 30

PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC

SERRANO FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HUGHES KEVIN D. ESQ.

SWARTZ CHARLES ALEXANDER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SOBODASH JUSTIN

Other Attorneys

SOBODASH JUSTIN DAVID

 

Court Documents

ANSWER-CONTRACT

1/2/2018: ANSWER-CONTRACT

DEFENDANT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; ETC

1/9/2018: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL

1/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL

Minute Order

12/11/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

11/28/2017: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/11/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF: (A) ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; AND

12/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF: (A) ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; AND

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

12/11/2017: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

Minute Order

11/7/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Unknown

11/22/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

6/29/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

SUMMONS

6/29/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/10/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

7/10/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/24/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

9/15/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

9/15/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 39; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 39; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 11/16/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (Of Entire Case); Filed by Perla Global Capital Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff); Fernando Serrano (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (Of Entire Case); Filed by Club Acquisition Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Joint Exhibit List; Filed by Club Acquisition Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Joint Witness List; Filed by Club Acquisition Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Perla Global Capital Advisors, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOBODASH JUSTIN DAVID