This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 18:49:41 (UTC).

PERLA DIAZ VS VACHAGAN AGHAJANYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 PERLA DIAZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VACHAGAN AGHAJANYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5032

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ PERLA

Defendants

AGHAJANYAN VACHAGAN

HATTAR HAEL

RAISER-CA LLC

RASIER LLC

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX HOLDINGS LLC

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP;

RPM PROPERTIES

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAZDANPANAH HAMED L

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/13/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/7/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2024
  • Hearing07/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Hearing12/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PERLA DIAZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PERLA DIAZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PERLA DIAZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERTSON'S READY MIX HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSON'S READY MIX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where RAISER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant