This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 10:42:02 (UTC).

PERI FORMWORK SYSTEMS, INC., A MARYLAND CORPORATION VS RELEVANT GROUP, LLC, A DELAWARE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 PERI FORMWORK SYSTEMS, INC , A MARYLAND CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RELEVANT GROUP, LLC, A DELAWARE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MEL RED RECANA and DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5307

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MEL RED RECANA

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERI FORMWORK SYSTEMS INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION

Defendants

FIVE CHAIRS CONSTRUCTION LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC

6421 SELMA WILCOX HOTEL LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC

RELEVANT GROUP LLC A DELAWARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERTRAM CHRISTY L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

1/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12/8/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (PLAINTIFF'S PERI FORMWORK SYSTEM PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST...) OF 12/09/2020

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (PLAINTIFF'S PERI FORMWORK SYSTEM PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST...) OF 12/09/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S PERI FORMWORK SYSTEM PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST...)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S PERI FORMWORK SYSTEM PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST...)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

12/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/24/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by PERI FORMWORK SYSTEMS, INC., a Maryland corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF PENDENCY OF ACTION); Filed by PERI FORMWORK SYSTEMS, INC., a Maryland corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 09:26 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Plaintiff's PERI Formwork System Peremptory Challenge Against...) of 12/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Plaintiff's PERI Formwork System Peremptory Challenge Against...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by PERI FORMWORK SYSTEMS, INC., a Maryland corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PERI FORMWORK SYSTEMS, INC., a Maryland corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PERI FORMWORK SYSTEMS, INC., a Maryland corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PERI FORMWORK SYSTEMS, INC., a Maryland corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peri Formwork Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RELEVANT GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 6421 SELMA WILCOX HOTEL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FIVE CHAIRS CONSTRUSTION LLC is a litigant