Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2021 at 17:31:15 (UTC).

PEREZ, SAMUEL VS MARADIAGA, RUBI

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 PEREZ, SAMUEL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MARADIAGA, RUBI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SKEBA, VALERIE L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1256

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SKEBA, VALERIE L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEREZ SAMUEL

Respondent

MARADIAGA RUBI

 

Court Documents

FCS - Agreement

12/29/2020: FCS - Agreement

Certificate of Completion

12/17/2020: Certificate of Completion

Minute Order

12/29/2020: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

11/16/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

11/16/2020: Minute Order

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Attend Mediation Appointment

11/16/2020: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Attend Mediation Appointment

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

10/28/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

10/28/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - **Partly Granted/Partly Denied**

10/28/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - **Partly Granted/Partly Denied**

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

10/28/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

10/28/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Proof of Service

11/2/2020: Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Skeba, Valerie L., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Completion; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Skeba, Valerie L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (**Partly Granted/Partly Denied** ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less