This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 10:26:56 (UTC).

PEREZ, MARIA DEL CARMEN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 PEREZ, MARIA DEL CARMEN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5778

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GALLARDO CARMEN

Decedent

PEREZ MARIA DEL CARMEN

Not Classified By Court

ACEVEDO CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

VELASCO PAUL DAVID

 

Court Documents

Will - Admitted

7/20/2021: Will - Admitted

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

7/30/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Letters (Initial)

8/4/2021: Letters (Initial)

Minute Order

7/20/2021: Minute Order

Will Deposited - 10 pgs - Dated - 07/10/2020

6/15/2021: Will Deposited - 10 pgs - Dated - 07/10/2020

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

6/23/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

6/29/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

6/10/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

6/10/2021: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketWill Deposited (10 pgs - Dated - 07/10/2020 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VELASCO PAUL DAVID