This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 04:38:51 (UTC).

PEREZ, GAUDENCIA VS GOMEZ, JOSE JUAN

Case Summary

On 05/16/2018 PEREZ, GAUDENCIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GOMEZ, JOSE JUAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0990

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEREZ GAUDENCIA

Respondent

GOMEZ JOSE JUAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice - Rejection (judgment package submitted 11.19.18 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Notice - Rejection (Judgment Package submitted 10/12/2018 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Notice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.