This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 01:57:01 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS ONE HUNDRED THOUSAND DO

Case Summary

On 03/07/2018 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ONE HUNDRED THOUSAND DO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2489

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Interested Party

ONE HUNDRED THOUSAND DOLLARS $100 000.00

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAK GRACE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND COURT HEARING DATES

8/22/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND COURT HEARING DATES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/30/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

9/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/15/2018: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

10/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Other -

10/15/2018: Other -

Application

10/15/2018: Application

Minute Order

7/19/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

7/19/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order

7/19/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

7/19/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/10/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/3/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/5/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

6/8/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

5/4/2018: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/4/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/4/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; (Order to Show Cause) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Docketat 2:56 PM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re: Application for Default Judgment of Forfeitur...) of 10/15/2018); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketOther - (Dismissal of Claim, Default Judgment of Forfeiture and Order of Distribution of Forfeiture Property); Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketApplication (for Default Judgment of Forfeiture and for Order of Distribution); Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Application for Default Judgment of Forfeitur...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON CHRISTOPHER JAMAAL LOVEJOY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON CHRISTOPHER JAMAAL LOVEJOY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON CORNELL LOVEJOY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON CORNELL LOVEJOY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON BRANDON LEE HILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON KENNETH JEFFREY TURNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ETSEQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less