This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2021 at 14:40:56 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS ONE HUNDRED FORTY-EIGHT THOUSAND FIVE HUNDRED FORTY DOLLARS ($148,540.00) IN U.S. CURRENCY

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ONE HUNDRED FORTY-EIGHT THOUSAND FIVE HUNDRED FORTY DOLLARS 148,540 00 IN U S CURRENCY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3859

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Respondent

ONE HUNDRED FORTY-EIGHT THOUSAND FIVE HUNDRED FORTY DOLLARS $148 540.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PAK GRACE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

12/18/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

11/20/2020: Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/24/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • Hearing03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Hearing01/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketPetition (PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.); Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less