This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2022 at 07:03:55 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. TIFFANY J. ISRAEL, SPECIAL COUNSEL FOR THE CITY OF LAWNDALE, ET AL. VS GERARDO HERRERA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL TIFFANY J ISRAEL, SPECIAL COUNSEL FOR THE CITY OF LAWNDALE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GERARDO HERRERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARY Y. TANAKA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0563

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GARY Y. TANAKA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITY OF LAWNDALE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. TIFFANY J. ISRAEL SPECIAL COUNSEL FOR THE CITY OF LAWNDALE

Defendants

HERRERA GERARD RICHARD III

HERRERA GERARDO

HERRERA RUTH EMILY

BOYD DARRYL

SIBLEY SEAN

Interested Party

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

Not Classified By Court

ADAMS MARK S.

CALIFORNIA RECEIVERSHIP GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TRINDLE GEORGE ROSCOE III

ISRAEL TIFFANY JOY

Defendant Attorney

POSNER ASHLEY D.

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

YATTEAU THOMAS A.

ADAMS MARK SAMUEL

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS

7/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS

Declaration - DECLARATION MAY 2022 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP INCOME, EXPENSES, AND INTERIM FEES

6/28/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION MAY 2022 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP INCOME, EXPENSES, AND INTERIM FEES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

7/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Motion re: - MOTION RE: OF MARK S. ADAMS, STATE COURT RECEIVER, TO APPROVE AND CONFIRM THE RETENTION OF ERVIN COHEN & JESSUP LLP AS GENERAL COUNSEL, EFFECTIVE APRIL 27, 2022

7/11/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: OF MARK S. ADAMS, STATE COURT RECEIVER, TO APPROVE AND CONFIRM THE RETENTION OF ERVIN COHEN & JESSUP LLP AS GENERAL COUNSEL, EFFECTIVE APRIL 27, 2022

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION REQUESTING ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF RECEIVERSHIP PROPERTY; (PROPOSED) ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF RECEIVERSHIP PROPERTY

6/22/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION REQUESTING ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF RECEIVERSHIP PROPERTY; (PROPOSED) ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF RECEIVERSHIP PROPERTY

Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF RECEIVERSHIP PROPERTY

6/22/2022: Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF RECEIVERSHIP PROPERTY

Order - (PROPOSED) ORDER APPROVING APRIL 2022 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING

6/22/2022: Order - (PROPOSED) ORDER APPROVING APRIL 2022 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Report of Receiver

5/31/2022: Report of Receiver

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Declaration - FIRST REPORT OF RECEIVER AND DECLARATION OF MARK ADAMS

4/27/2022: Declaration - FIRST REPORT OF RECEIVER AND DECLARATION OF MARK ADAMS

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING INCREASE TO RECEIVER'S CERTIFICATE

4/27/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING INCREASE TO RECEIVER'S CERTIFICATE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TREVOR AXT RE: NOTICE

4/27/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TREVOR AXT RE: NOTICE

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT SEAN SIBLEY TO RECEIVER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER INCREASING CERTIFICATE TO CONDUCT CONSTRUCTION AND ENGAGE IN LITIGATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORIT

4/28/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT SEAN SIBLEY TO RECEIVER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER INCREASING CERTIFICATE TO CONDUCT CONSTRUCTION AND ENGAGE IN LITIGATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORIT

Declaration - MARCH 2022 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP INCOME, EXPENSES, AND INTERIM FEES; (PROPOSED) ORDER

4/29/2022: Declaration - MARCH 2022 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP INCOME, EXPENSES, AND INTERIM FEES; (PROPOSED) ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING INCREAS...)

4/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING INCREAS...)

Case Management Statement

5/3/2022: Case Management Statement

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • Hearing11/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION OF MARK S. ADAMS, STATE COURT RECEIVER, TO APPROVE AND CONFIRM THE RETENTION OF ERVIN COHEN & JESSUP LLP AS GENERAL COUNSEL, EFFECTIVE APRIL 27, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Hearing09/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Hearing09/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS); Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. TIFFANY J. ISRAEL, Special Counsel for the City of Lawndale (Plaintiff); CITY OF LAWNDALE, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketMotion re: (of Mark S. Adams, State Court Receiver, to Approve and Confirm the Retention of Ervin Cohen & Jessup Llp as General Counsel, Effective April 27, 2022); Filed by Mark S. Adams (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Order); Filed by Mark S. Adams (Non-Party); California Receivership Group (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (May 2022 Monthly Accounting of Receivership Income, Expenses, and Interim Fees); Filed by California Receivership Group (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, Gary Y. Tanaka, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOrder (ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF RECEIVERSHIP PROPERTY); Filed by California Receivership Group (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint (1st)); Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. TIFFANY J. ISRAEL, Special Counsel for the City of Lawndale (Plaintiff); CITY OF LAWNDALE, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( 1st ); Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. TIFFANY J. ISRAEL, Special Counsel for the City of Lawndale (Plaintiff); CITY OF LAWNDALE, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. TIFFANY J. ISRAEL, Special Counsel for the City of Lawndale (Plaintiff); CITY OF LAWNDALE, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. TIFFANY J. ISRAEL, Special Counsel for the City of Lawndale (Plaintiff); CITY OF LAWNDALE, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. TIFFANY J. ISRAEL, Special Counsel for the City of Lawndale (Plaintiff); CITY OF LAWNDALE, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. TIFFANY J. ISRAEL, Special Counsel for the City of Lawndale (Plaintiff); CITY OF LAWNDALE, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. TIFFANY J. ISRAEL, Special Counsel for the City of Lawndale (Plaintiff); CITY OF LAWNDALE, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA RECEIVERSHIP GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LAWNDALE is a litigant