This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 03:43:09 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY VS BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY filed an Other lawsuit against BOWMAN PLATING CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0167

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

Defendants

BOWMAN PLATING CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ESFANDI MAC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILCHRIST BAYRON

Defendant Attorney

GROVEMAN BARRY CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/22/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

10/4/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

RETURNED MAIL

9/26/2022: RETURNED MAIL

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/8/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/16/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/30/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.138...)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.138...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAPHNE HSU IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

4/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAPHNE HSU IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Proof of Service by Mail

4/7/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/10/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Case Management Statement

2/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Settlement

2/26/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

2/26/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/20/2020: Case Management Statement

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, a Public Entity on 07/02/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, a Public Entity as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to CRC, Rule 3.1385(b) and (c) with the Court to Retain Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP 664.6 scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, a Public Entity (Plaintiff); As to: BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MAC ESFANDI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Compton Courthouse in Department B - Hon. George F. Birdeffective 10/10/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice OF CASE REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, a Public Entity (Plaintiff); As to: BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MAC ESFANDI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MAC ESFANDI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 04/17/2023 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to CRC, Rule 3.1385(b) and (c) with the Court to Retain Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP 664.6: Location changed from Department A to Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice OF CASE REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, a Public Entity (Plaintiff); As to: BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Compton Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Michael Shultzeffective 07/11/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, a Public Entity (Plaintiff); As to: MAC ESFANDI (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/13/2020; Service Cost: 113.85; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, a Public Entity (Plaintiff); As to: BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/13/2020; Service Cost: 145.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, a Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, a Public Entity (Plaintiff); As to: BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MAC ESFANDI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, a Public Entity (Plaintiff); As to: BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MAC ESFANDI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ex rel. SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, a Public Entity (Plaintiff); As to: BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MAC ESFANDI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department A Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less