This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 15:47:28 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, EX REL. MEREDITH WILLIAMS, DIRECTOR OF THE DEPARTMENT OF TOXIC SUBSTANCES CONTROL VS EMERALD TRANSFORMER LOS ANGELES, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, EX REL MEREDITH WILLIAMS, DIRECTOR OF THE DEPARTMENT OF TOXIC SUBSTANCES CONTROL filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against EMERALD TRANSFORMER LOS ANGELES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM, DAVID J. COWAN, TERESA A. BEAUDET and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9365

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

DAVID J. COWAN

TERESA A. BEAUDET

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. MEREDITH WILLIAMS DIRECTOR OF THE DEPARTMENT OF TOXIC SUBSTANCES CONTROL

Defendants

CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC.

EMERALD TRANSFORMER LOS ANGELES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBATO ADRIANNA L.

Defendant Attorneys

ELLIOTT MARK

ESKENAZI PHILLIP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/16/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/16/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/16/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/16/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

1/7/2022: Answer

Answer - ANSWER AMENDED

1/18/2022: Answer - ANSWER AMENDED

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

1/20/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/24/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

1/24/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

1/27/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Case Management Statement

2/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

2/25/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

2/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Case Management Order

3/14/2022: Case Management Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/03/2021

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/03/2021

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • Hearing04/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 4:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docketat 5:30 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Emerald Transformer Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by People of the State of California, ex rel. Meredith Williams, Director of the Department of Toxic Substances Control (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:37 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 11/08/2021, Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Notice - First Amended General Order in Re LASC Mandatory Electronic Filing for Civil - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipul...); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docketat 4:24 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of 11/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by People of the State of California, ex rel. Meredith Williams, Director of the Department of Toxic Substances Control (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by People of the State of California, ex rel. Meredith Williams, Director of the Department of Toxic Substances Control (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by People of the State of California, ex rel. Meredith Williams, Director of the Department of Toxic Substances Control (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Corporation is a litigant