This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2021 at 05:00:47 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD VS SPEEDY FUEL, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD filed an Other lawsuit against SPEEDY FUEL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8251

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD

Defendant

SPEEDY FUEL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVITAN ADAM L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

5/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/14/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Related Case

5/19/2021: Notice of Related Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by People of the State of California ex rel California Air Resources Board (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by People of the State of California ex rel California Air Resources Board (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by People of the State of California ex rel California Air Resources Board (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less