This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2019 at 02:40:14 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CA VS TOM PHAM

Case Summary

On 08/24/2017 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CA filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against TOM PHAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER, RAUL A. SAHAGUN and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6520

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

BELLFLOWER CITY OF A GENERAL LAW CITY

BERGER KARL H. CITY ATTORNEY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALONDRA GARDEN LLC

PHAM TOM

ABOVE THE CLOUDS

CLOUDS ABOVE THE DBA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PHAM TOM

CLOUDS ABOVE THE DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HENSLEY LAW GROUP

KOVACEVICH GREGORY ALAN

KING DAVID H

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SZKOLNIK FRED M.

DANIEL S. MILLER

SZKOLNIK FRED MILTON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT ALONDRA GARDEN LLC, FROM COMPLAINT, ONLY

6/17/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT ALONDRA GARDEN LLC, FROM COMPLAINT, ONLY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING E...)

8/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING E...)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

8/20/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/9/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING E...)

9/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING E...)

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DAVID KING

9/9/2019: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DAVID KING

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Complaint filed-Summons Issued

8/24/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Complaint filed-Summons Issued

Summons

8/24/2017: Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

9/18/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

Answer

10/12/2017: Answer

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

11/16/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-11-22 00:00:00

11/22/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-11-22 00:00:00

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-12-22 00:00:00

12/22/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-12-22 00:00:00

Case Management Statement

2/14/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-02-23 00:00:00

2/23/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-02-23 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Request for Correction

4/20/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Request for Correction

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Default Entered

5/15/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Default Entered

Notice of Trial -

8/30/2018: Notice of Trial -

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial ((time estimate for trial is 3-5 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); BERGER, KARL H., City Attorney (Plaintiff); BELLFLOWER, CITY OF, a general law city (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (regarding entry of default judgment after default prove up hearing) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (re: Application for court default judgment 2. Supplemental declaration of David King 3 Supplemental declaration of David Fawcett 4 (Proposed) Judgment); Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); BERGER, KARL H., City Attorney (Plaintiff); BELLFLOWER, CITY OF, a general law city (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (of David King in support of plaintiff's application for default judgment); Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); BERGER, KARL H., City Attorney (Plaintiff); BELLFLOWER, CITY OF, a general law city (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); BELLFLOWER, CITY OF, a general law city (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (Supplemental Declaration Of David King); Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); BELLFLOWER, CITY OF, a general law city (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (Supplemental Declaration Of David Fawcett); Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); BELLFLOWER, CITY OF, a general law city (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); BERGER, KARL H., City Attorney (Plaintiff); BELLFLOWER, CITY OF, a general law city (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases (VC066368-- TOM PHAM dba ABOVE THE CLOUDS VS CITY OF BELLFLOWER ET.AL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); BERGER, KARL H., City Attorney (Plaintiff); BELLFLOWER, CITY OF, a general law city (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); BERGER, KARL H., City Attorney (Plaintiff); BELLFLOWER, CITY OF, a general law city (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLFLOWER CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZKOLNIK FRED M.