This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 04:53:20 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CA ET AL VS LCF ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/24/2018 a Contract - Business case was filed by PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CA against LCF in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1578

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

ROBERT S. DRAPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

WICKHAM MARY C. COUNTY COUNSEL FOR THE

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

Defendants and Respondents

CHEN WEI C.

DOES 1 TO 10

CHEN SANDRA C.

Respondents

LCF LLC

CHEN SANDRA C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/25/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/2/2019: Minute Order

Notice

10/31/2018: Notice

Minute Order

10/15/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/6/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/10/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

7/25/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/6/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/21/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/21/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

5/24/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/26/2018: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/28/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON LCF, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

2/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON LCF, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON WEI C. CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL

2/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON WEI C. CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON SANDRA C. CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL

2/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON SANDRA C. CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/30/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

1/24/2018: SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Notice (of recording Lis Pendens); Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff); Los Angeles, County of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON LCF, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON SANDRA C. CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON WEI C. CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff); Wickham, Mary C., County Counsel for the (Plaintiff); Los Angeles, County of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • COMPLAINT TO ABATE VIOLATIONS OF THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY CODE AND ENJOIN UNLAWFUL BUSINESS PRACTICES AND FOR INJUNCTIVE, MONETARY, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

NO FEE DUE GOV'T CODE § 6103

MARY C. WICKHAM, County Counsel ‘ ELAINE M. LEMKE, Assistant County Counsel FILED JESSICA L. COHEN, Senior Associate County Counsel Supe=~ ot of O vnia (SBN 274256) * jcohen@counsel.lacounty.gov Cou: iy of Los Arigsles 648 Kenneth Hahn Hall of Administration ro o 500 West Temple Street FEB 21 2018 Los Angeles, California 90012-2713 — C Evaritin ¢ M Telephone: (213) 974-1924 - Fax: (213) 613-4751 Sherri i, Carte:. Exgaunve Otiicer/Clerk

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CASE NO. BC691578 CALIFORNIA, by and through MARY C. ' WICKHAM, County Counsel for the County PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT

of Los Angeles; and COUNTY OF ON LCF, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LOS ANGELES, . LIABILITY COMPANY Plaintiffs, Assigned to the Hon. Gail Ruderman Feuer, Dept. 78 V.

LCF, LLC, a California limited liability company; SANDRA C. CHEN, an individual, WEI C. CHEN, an individual; AND DOES 1 THROUGH 10, inclusive,

Defendants.