This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 00:04:28 (UTC).

PEOPLE & LOGISTICS AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 PEOPLE LOGISTICS AMERICA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3647

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE & LOGISTICS AMERICA INC.

Defendants

THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY AKA CNA A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION

INTERSTATE MUTUAL INSURANCE BROKERAGE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE JONG K.

Defendant Attorney

CHURAN AMY MARIE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/21/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/21/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/21/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/21/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

8/18/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

8/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/26/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

9/16/2022: Motion for Stay of Proceedings

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketMotion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by The Continental Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by People & Logistics America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by People & Logistics America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by People & Logistics America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by People & Logistics America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by People & Logistics America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by People & Logistics America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEOPLE & LOGISTICS AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Continental Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHURAN AMY MARIE