This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:02:15 (UTC).

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. VS. E.R.R.A. BROTHERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO , L P filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against E R R A BROTHERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8829

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. L.P.

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

DOES 1-25

TOTAL TRANSPORTATION CONCEPT INC.

TOTAL TRANSPORATION CONCEPT INC.

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL

E.R.R.A. BROTHERS INC. L.P.

E.R.R.A. BROTHERS A CALIFORNIA

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLAW CURTIS D.

Defendant Attorney

NAHAI BEHZAD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/17/2018: Request for Dismissal

Other -

7/17/2018: Other -

Minute Order

7/23/2018: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/7/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown

9/7/2018: Unknown

Declaration

9/7/2018: Declaration

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to this date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • Demurrer; Filed by E.R.R.A. BROTHERS, INC., L.P. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Memorandum - Other; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Application ; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAHAI BEHZAD