Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 08:22:34 (UTC).

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., LP. VS. AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERN.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO , LP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8830

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. L.P.

Defendants

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL LLC

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL

DOES 1-25

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLAW CURTIS D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TOPROSECUTE OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Default Judgment (JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Declaration (OF JEFF HURD IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT AGAINST DEFT. AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, LLC PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 585(D)); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • Application ; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Memorandum - Other (OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO SERVE DEFTS. THROUGH THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Declaration (OF ATTORNEY CURTIS D. COLAW IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO SERVE DEFTS THROUGH THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Application - Miscellaneous (TO SERVE DEFTS THROUGH THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colaw, Curtis D