Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 10:56:31 (UTC).

PENNIALL, TYLER SLIGHT -CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 PENNIALL, TYLER SLIGHT -CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1349

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PENNIALL RICHARD G.

Not Classified By Court

PENNIALL TYLER SLIGHT

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

OVERGAARD CHRISTOPHER EDWARD

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HOLLOWAY GEORGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship (Person Only - Limited ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination (Determination of Conservatees Appropriate Level of Care ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Order (Proposed Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • in Probate Department 57; Appointment Hearing - Conservator/Guardian - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Report - Regional Center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Waived - Conservatorship Review Fee/Asssessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Supplement (To Petition For Appointment of Limited Conservator of The Person ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Order - Appointing Counsel; Filed by PVP Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Citation (Citations ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Petition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial) (Petition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Notification - Cons/Guard Address (Notification - Cons/Guard Address ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (Request to Waive Court Fees ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Confidential Screening Form (Confidential Screening Form ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (Proposed Order )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Confidential Supplemental Info Sheet (Confidential Supplemental Info Sheet ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OVERGAARD CHRISTOPHER EDWARD