Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2019 at 00:58:30 (UTC).

PENG ZHANG, VS. PING CHEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 PENG ZHANG filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PING CHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7863

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZHANG PENG

Defendants

LOU JI HUI

HIGHLAND INVESTMENT GROUP INC.

CHEN PING

HIGHLAND REAL ESTATE

DENUTO JANICE

REALTY ONE GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT S. ALTAGEN INC.

Defendant Attorneys

KEITH G. BREMER

MURPHY PEARSON BRADLEY & FEENEY

BREMER KEITH G.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/14/2019: Request for Dismissal

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/18/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/1/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/9/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00

3/26/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

3/28/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/5/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation and Order

7/3/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation and Order

Answer

7/24/2018: Answer

Case Management Statement

8/7/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury Civil Deposit

8/14/2018: Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury Civil Deposit

Notice - Notice of Case Reassignment

2/13/2019: Notice - Notice of Case Reassignment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application for Order Shortening Time fo...)

2/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application for Order Shortening Time fo...)

Order - Order Re Ex Parte Application by Peng Zhang for Order shortening time for motion for trial continuance per stipulation

2/20/2019: Order - Order Re Ex Parte Application by Peng Zhang for Order shortening time for motion for trial continuance per stipulation

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT S. ALTAGEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO PUBLISH SUMMONS

3/29/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT S. ALTAGEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO PUBLISH SUMMONS

Answer -

7/24/2018: Answer -

Proof of Service by Mail

10/26/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement -

8/2/2018: Case Management Statement -

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • Hearing12/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docketat 11:21 AM in Department B; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Janice Denuto (Defendant); Highland Investment Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/01/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Janice Denuto (Defendant); Highland Investment Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Ji Hui Lou (Defendant); Realty One Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ji Hui Lou (Defendant); Realty One Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peng Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Peng Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Peng Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REALTY ONE GROUP INC is a litigant