Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 04:23:34 (UTC).

PEGI SHAHNAZARIAN VS TOTAL TRANSPORTATION & DISTRIBUTION INC., A BUSINESS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 PEGI SHAHNAZARIAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TOTAL TRANSPORTATION DISTRIBUTION INC , A BUSINESS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9062

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAHNAZARIAN PEGI

Defendants

TOTAL TRANSPORTATION & DISTRIBUTION INC. A BUSINESS

FLORES JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BERGSTEN ROBERT T.

Other Attorneys

MIRZAIE NARAK

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

2/16/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

1/26/2021: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/23/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Pegi Shahnazarian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Total Transportation & Distribution Inc., a Business (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Pegi Shahnazarian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pegi Shahnazarian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pegi Shahnazarian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pegi Shahnazarian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pegi Shahnazarian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOTAL TRANSPORTATION & DISTRIBUTION INC. A BUSINESS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIRZAIE NARAK