Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 00:53:43 (UTC).

PEGGY LESSINGER VS 1575 HASLAM TERRACE 2013 LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/09/2018 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by PEGGY LESSINGER against 1575 HASLAM TERRACE 2013 LLC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1441

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LESSINGER PEGGY

Defendants and Respondents

HASSELS-WEILER EKKEHART

1575 HASLAM TERRACE 2013 LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/9/2018: SUMMONS

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

2/13/2019: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OFJUDGMENT

4/19/2018: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OFJUDGMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/13/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

7/30/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF RICHARD I. ARSHONSKY IN SUPPORT OF THE AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE

7/12/2018: DECLARATION OF RICHARD I. ARSHONSKY IN SUPPORT OF THE AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1575 HASLAM TERRACE 2013, LLC'S VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF, ETC

8/14/2018: 1575 HASLAM TERRACE 2013, LLC'S VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF, ETC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/13/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/28/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

SUMMONS-CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/14/2018: SUMMONS-CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

4/19/2018: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

Notice of Ruling

1/7/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

9/11/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/31/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/20/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

CROSS-DEFENDANT PEGGY LESSINGER'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/18/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT PEGGY LESSINGER'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 49; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (OR a Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice (RE: HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE BEING TAKEN OFF OF COURT'S CALENDAR); Filed by Peggy Lessinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 49; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (OR a Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE); Filed by Peggy Lessinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Peggy Lessinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 49; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Peggy Lessinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 49; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Peggy Lessinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Peggy Lessinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Peggy Lessinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OFJUDGMENT NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • PLALNTIFF PEGGY LESSINGER'S 1. COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE, OR OTHER RELIEF FOR: 1. TRESPASS 2. QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Peggy Lessinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less