This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 08:13:50 (UTC).

PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOES 1 THROUGH 50. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0783

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

RED POINTE ROOFING LP

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

RED POINTE ROOFING LP

GAMA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC.

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GAMA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC.

VIG FURNITURE INC.

ARDENT ENVIROMENTAL GROUP INC.

MOES 1 - 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ROTH MARK STEVEN

BREDESON CHRISTIAN E.

KHONSARI AREZOU

ROTH MARK

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PARK RAYMOND J.

PARK RAYMOND JAY

ROSVALL ROBERT L

BREDESON CHRISTIAN E.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

6/30/2021: Answer

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

6/14/2021: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT RED POINTE ROOFING, LPS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO VIG FURNITURE INC.S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/14/2021: Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT RED POINTE ROOFING, LPS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO VIG FURNITURE INC.S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER - HEARING HELD JUNE 22, 2021) OF 06/23/2021

6/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER - HEARING HELD JUNE 22, 2021) OF 06/23/2021

Order - RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER (HEARING HELD 6-22-21)

6/23/2021: Order - RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER (HEARING HELD 6-22-21)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER - HEARING HELD JUNE 22, 2021)

6/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER - HEARING HELD JUNE 22, 2021)

Notice of Ruling

6/29/2021: Notice of Ruling

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO VIG FURNITURE INC.'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/9/2021: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO VIG FURNITURE INC.'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION RED POINTE ROOFING LP'S OPPOSITION TO VIG FURNITURE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/9/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION RED POINTE ROOFING LP'S OPPOSITION TO VIG FURNITURE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Firm Name

4/22/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

1/5/2021: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESP...)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESP...)

Notice of Ruling

1/6/2021: Notice of Ruling

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT VIG FURNITURE'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/9/2020: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT VIG FURNITURE'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

12/9/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK S. ROTH IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT VIG FURNITURES DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/9/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK S. ROTH IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT VIG FURNITURES DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Hearing12/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: (answer/responsive pleading as to the Cross Complaint) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docketat 1:53 PM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by VIG Furniture, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketat 09:31 AM in Department C; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER - HEARING HELD JUNE 22, 2021)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) ([Doe 1] Red Pointe Roofing LP); Filed by Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19NWCV00783    Hearing Date: October 22, 2020    Dept: C

PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY v. DOES 1 THROUGH 50

CASE NO.: 19NWCV00783

HEARING: 10/22/2020

#2

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendant RED POINTE ROOFING LP’s unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint is GRANTED. C.C.P. §428.50.

Moving Party to give Notice.

The proposed Cross-Complaint, attached as Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Raymond J. Park is NOT deemed filed and served as of the hearing date. Moving Party is ORDERED to FILE and SERVE the Cross-Complaint within 5 court days of the hearing date. Responsive pleadings are to be filed in accordance with the rules of civil procedure.

Defendant RED POINTE ROOFING LP (“Red Pointe”) moves for leave to file a Cross-Complaint against GAMA CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC.; ARDENT ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, INC.; and VIG FURNITURE, INC. for: express contractual indemnity, breach of contract, equitable indemnity, contribution, and declaratory relief.

CCP §428.50 states: “(a) A party shall file a cross-complaint against any of the parties who filed the complaint or cross-complaint against him or her before or at the same time as the answer to the complaint or cross-complaint. (b) Any other cross-complaint may be filed at any time before the court has set a date for trial. (c) A party shall obtain leave of court to file any cross-complaint except one filed within the time specified in subdivision (a) or (b). Leave may be granted in the interest of justice at any time during the course of action.” CCP §426.50 states, “A party who fails to plead a cause of action…whether through oversight, inadvertence, mistake, neglect, or other cause, may apply to the court for leave to amend his pleading, or to file a cross-complaint, to assert such cause at any time during the course of the action. The court, after notice to the adverse party, shall grant, upon such terms as may be just to the parties, leave to amend the pleading, or to file the cross-complaint…if the party who failed to plead the cause acted in good faith. This subdivision shall be liberally construed to avoid forfeiture of causes of action.”

No trial date has been set in this action. Moreover, the Court finds that it would serve the interests of justice to grant Red Pointe’s Motion because it is best to avoid multiplicity or duplicity of actions, and there is no evidence of bad faith on the part of Red Pointe. The Motion is GRANTED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAMA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Red Pointe Roofing LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where VIG FURNITURE INC. (DOE 1) is a litigant