This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 04:01:51 (UTC).

PEDRO YESCAS LOPEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CHANELLE SMITH

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 PEDRO YESCAS LOPEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHANELLE SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6761

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ AN INDIVIDUAL PEDRO YESCAS

Defendant

SMITH CHANELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMASSIAN VACHE

Defendant Attorney

OLSON SONALI

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/18/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/18/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/18/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/18/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/14/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/24/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2024
  • Hearing08/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2024
  • Hearing02/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2024
  • Hearing02/01/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: PEDRO YESCAS LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: PEDRO YESCAS LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CHANELLE SMITH (Defendant); As to: PEDRO YESCAS LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PEDRO YESCAS LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: CHANELLE SMITH (Defendant); Service Date: 08/24/2022; Service Cost: 116.43; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PEDRO YESCAS LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: CHANELLE SMITH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PEDRO YESCAS LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: CHANELLE SMITH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PEDRO YESCAS LOPEZ, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: CHANELLE SMITH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/01/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLSON SONALI