This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 04:51:23 (UTC).

PEDRO SOLANO VS TOP STONE CONSTRUCTION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/24/2017 PEDRO SOLANO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TOP STONE CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1840

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SOLANO PEDRO

Respondents and Defendants

YIN JONATHAN

TOP STONE CONSTRUCTION INC

DOES 1 TO 20

HERMOSA STONE INC

SELECTIVE STONE INC

WANG DOE 1 BRANDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DENIS PAUL J.

DENIS PAUL JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/12/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/19/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/12/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/30/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/30/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/30/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/30/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/30/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

7/31/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/17/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/17/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAUL AND COURT JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/17/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAUL AND COURT JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAUL AND COURT JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/17/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAUL AND COURT JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service

9/17/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/17/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/17/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/17/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/17/2018: Proof of Service

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketOrder (re (5) requests for default judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Pedro Solano in support of application for default judgment); Filed by Pedro Solano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Paul Denis in support of application for default judgment); Filed by Pedro Solano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Pedro Solano in support of application for default judgment); Filed by Pedro Solano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Paul Denis in support of application for default judgment); Filed by Pedro Solano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Pedro Solano in support of application for default judgment); Filed by Pedro Solano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Paul Denis in support of application for default judgment); Filed by Pedro Solano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Paul Denis in support of application for default judgment); Filed by Pedro Solano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pedro Solano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketNOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pedro Solano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY ALL WAGES INCLUDING OVERTIME COMPENSATION; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1840    Hearing Date: July 29, 2020    Dept: 50

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

pedro solano,

Plaintiff,

vs.

top stone construction, inc., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 651840

Hearing Date:

July 29, 2020

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

PLAINTIFF’S REQUESTS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Plaintiff Pedro Solano (“Plaintiff”) requests default judgment against Defendants Selective Stone, Inc. and Jonathan Yin. Plaintiff seeks judgment in the amount of $79,040.76, reflecting $75,000 demanded in the complaint, $1,650.76 in costs, and $2,390 in attorney’s fees.

The Court notes that Plaintiff has addressed the defects identified in the Court’s July 16, 2020 order. However, the Court notes that Plaintiff did not file a Request for Court Judgment as to Defendant Top Stone Construction, Inc. (“Top Stone”) but the Court did receive a courtesy copy thereof.

Based on the foregoing, the Court intends to grant Plaintiff’s requests for default judgment but will require Plaintiff to promptly file the missing Request for Court Judgment as to Defendant Top Stone. The Court has signed the Judgments as to Defendants Selective Stone Inc. and Jonathan Yin.

DATED: July 29, 2020

________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court



Case Number: ****1840    Hearing Date: July 16, 2020    Dept: 50

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

pedro solano,

Plaintiff,

vs.

top stone construction, inc., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 651840

Hearing Date:

July 16, 2020

Hearing Time:

10:00 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

PLAINTIFF’S REQUESTS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Plaintiff Pedro Solano (“Plaintiff”) requests default judgment against Defendants Top Stone Construction, Inc., Selective Stone, Inc., and Jonathan Yin. Plaintiff seeks judgment in the amount of $79,040.76, reflecting $75,000 demanded in the complaint, $1,650.76 in costs, and $2,390 in attorney’s fees.

Although this is Plaintiff’s third submission, the Court again finds several problems.

First, Plaintiff has again failed to submit a Request for Court Judgment (Form CIV-100) for each of the defendants against whom default judgment is sought. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1800(a).) Because Plaintiff failed to submit Form CIV-100, Plaintiff also failed to submit a memorandum of costs and a declaration of nonmilitary status for each defendant against whom judgment is sought. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1800(a).) Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s request for default judgment is continued to July 29, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. so Plaintiff may file the missing forms.

DATED: July 16, 2020 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court