This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 17:31:59 (UTC).

PEDRO SERRANO-TRUJILLO, ET AL. VS SYSTEMS SOURCE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 PEDRO SERRANO-TRUJILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SYSTEMS SOURCE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0628

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ DYLAN LIAM

LOPEZ MARINEZ BLANCA PAULINA

SERRANO-TRUJILLO PEDRO

Defendants

CADENA ALEJANDRO

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

SYSTEMS SOURCE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEECHER BRIAN G.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/20/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

9/20/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/20/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DYLAN

9/22/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DYLAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2024
  • Hearing09/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2024
  • Hearing03/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2024
  • Hearing03/05/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Dylan); Filed by PEDRO SERRANO-TRUJILLO (Plaintiff); BLANCA PAULINA LOPEZ MARINEZ (Plaintiff); Dylan Liam Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PEDRO SERRANO-TRUJILLO (Plaintiff); BLANCA PAULINA LOPEZ MARINEZ (Plaintiff); Dylan Liam Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PEDRO SERRANO-TRUJILLO (Plaintiff); BLANCA PAULINA LOPEZ MARINEZ (Plaintiff); Dylan Liam Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYSTEMS SOURCE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN G. BEECHER