Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 14:04:58 (UTC).

PEDRO RAMIREZ VS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 PEDRO RAMIREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3813

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ PEDRO

Defendants

THE ANGELES CLINIC AND RESEARCH INSTITUTE INC.

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARR MIKE T.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY STATE COURT ACTION AND SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION BEFORE JAMS; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/16/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY STATE COURT ACTION AND SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION BEFORE JAMS; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION

4/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION

Proof of Personal Service

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/12/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • Hearing04/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION); Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant); The Angeles Clinic and Research Institute, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY STATE COURT ACTION AND SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION BEFORE JAMS; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Pedro Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pedro Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pedro Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pedro Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pedro Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARR MIKE T.