This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 07:51:32 (UTC).

PEDRO N CONTRERAS ET AL VS CITY OF PARAMOUNT ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 PEDRO N CONTRERAS filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF PARAMOUNT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0762

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondents and Petitioners

CONTRERAS PEDRO N.

CONTRERAS MARIA A.

Respondents and Defendants

CODE ENFORCEMENT DEPARTMENT

MERAZ MARIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SHERIFF'S DEPART-

ARREDONDO ANGEL

GARCIA ANTULIO

PARAMOUNT CITY OF

BASTISTA RICHARD

CASTRO BETTY

CAVANAUGH JOHN E. ESQ

COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT DEPT

CITY OF PARAMOUNT

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

CITY OF PARAMOUNT CODE ENFORCEMENT DEPARTMENT A MUNICIPAL PUBLIC AGENCY

CITY OF PARAMOUNT COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT DEPT

Respondents, Defendants and Petitioners

CODE ENFORCEMENT DEPARTMENT

MERAZ MARIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SHERIFF'S DEPART-

ARREDONDO ANGEL

GARCIA ANTULIO

PARAMOUNT CITY OF

BASTISTA RICHARD

CONTRERAS PEDRO N.

CASTRO BETTY

CAVANAUGH JOHN E. ESQ

COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT DEPT

CONTRERAS MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DEVEREUX MICHAEL SEAN

Defendant Attorneys

HUYNH SUNNY H.

NELSON HENRY PATRICK

MARTYN ELIZABETH L

Respondent Attorney

NELSON HENRY PATRICK ESQ.

Other Attorneys

CONTRERAS PEDRO N.

CONTRERAS MARIA A.

WEX LAW

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

1/24/2018: AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

2/27/2018: DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. KANE IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION FOR FILING A MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/1/2018: DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. KANE IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION FOR FILING A MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/4/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERNECE AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

4/11/2018: NOTICE OF RULING AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERNECE AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order

6/15/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/3/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/9/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

7/9/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Unknown

8/1/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

8/8/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGFMFNT CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND NOTICE OF OSC RE I)ISMISSAL

8/27/2018: NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGFMFNT CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND NOTICE OF OSC RE I)ISMISSAL

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

9/11/2018: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

Minute Order

9/25/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

9/25/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Request

11/27/2018: Request

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

11/27/2018: Motion for Stay of Proceedings

Case Management Statement

12/28/2018: Case Management Statement

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by City of Paramount (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Filed by City of Paramount (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Sunny Huynh RE Service of Proposed Final Judgment); Filed by City of Paramount (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by City of Paramount (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For Motion to Dismiss for Failure to File Second Amended Complaint) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For Motion to Dismiss for Failure to File Second Amended Complaint); Filed by City of Paramount (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketOrder (Granting Motion To Dismiss); Filed by City of Paramount Code Enforcement Department, a Municipal Public Agency (Defendant); City of Paramount Community Development Dept (Defendant); City of Paramount (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Motion to Dismiss for Fai...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Proposed Order); Filed by City of Paramount (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 86; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Denied) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-09-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR EX PARTE ORDER FOR AN IMMEDIATE STAY AGAINST DEFENDANT'S ATTEMPT TO DEMOLISH PLAINTIFF'S DWELLING DECLARATION OF PEDRO N. CONTRERAS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ORDER THEREON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS PETITION FOR AN EXTRAORDINARY WRIT OF MANDAMUS (CCP 1085, 1094.5)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT DEPT is a litigant

Latest cases where PARAMOUNT CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF PARAMOUNT A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant