This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 18:43:10 (UTC).

PEDRO MACHIC VS ELIT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 PEDRO MACHIC filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ELIT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5228

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACHIC PEDRO

Defendants

VENTURA CARLOS

CARLOS S VENTURA SOLE PROP DBA VENTURA PAINTING

ELIT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/2/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/2/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/25/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PEDRO MACHIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PEDRO MACHIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PEDRO MACHIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less