This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 04:42:21 (UTC).

PEDRO GONZALO AVILA, ET AL. VS MARK STEVEN HASSOLDT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 PEDRO GONZALO AVILA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARK STEVEN HASSOLDT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1780

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AVILA MARTHA

AVILA PEDRO GONZALO

Defendants

CITY OF TORRANCE

HASSOLDT MARK STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAYNHAM KENNETH EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

STRADER TATIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

12/16/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2024
  • Hearing11/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • Hearing04/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mark Steven Hassoldt (Defendant); City of Torrance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pedro Gonzalo Avila (Plaintiff); Martha Avila (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pedro Gonzalo Avila (Plaintiff); Martha Avila (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pedro Gonzalo Avila (Plaintiff); Martha Avila (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TATIA Y. STRADER