This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 05:22:35 (UTC).

PEDRO GOMEZ VS S JOSEPH GREEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 PEDRO GOMEZ filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against S JOSEPH GREEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7831

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GOMEZ PEDRO

Defendants and Respondents

GP MERGER SUB INCORPORATION

GREEN S. JOSEPH

DOES 1 TO 25

GLASPRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RYU YOUNG W.

STERLING SARAH K.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CLINTON & CLINTON

ROSE ROBERT HURWITZ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/14/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice

11/20/2018: Notice

Stipulation and Order

3/7/2019: Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order

3/20/2019: Stipulation and Order

Complaint

3/21/2019: Complaint

Unknown

5/16/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

5/23/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

6/6/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

6/12/2019: Minute Order

Response

3/1/2018: Response

Response

3/9/2018: Response

Minute Order

3/16/2018: Minute Order

Order

3/20/2018: Order

Minute Order

1/18/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

1/8/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

12/20/2017: SUMMONS

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT 1. MISSED REST BREAKS IN VIOLATION OF INDUSTRIAL WELFARE COMMISSION WAGE ORDERS 4 AND CAL. LABOR CODE 200, 226.7, AND 12 CCR 11040; ETC

12/20/2017: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT 1. MISSED REST BREAKS IN VIOLATION OF INDUSTRIAL WELFARE COMMISSION WAGE ORDERS 4 AND CAL. LABOR CODE 200, 226.7, AND 12 CCR 11040; ETC

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Joint Statement for Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Joint Statement for Status Conference; Filed by Pedro Gomez (Plaintiff); GP Merger Sub Incorporation (Defendant); S. Joseph Green (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Pedro Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Pedro Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (to File First Amended Complaint); Filed by Pedro Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Order -CLASS ACTION INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Minute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Proof of Service Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Pedro Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Pedro Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT 1. MISSED REST BREAKS IN VIOLATION OF INDUSTRIAL WELFARE COMMISSION WAGE ORDERS 4 AND CAL. LABOR CODE 200, 226.7, AND 12 CCR 11040; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Pedro Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

LOYR, APC

Young W. Ryu, Esq. (SBN 266372) young.ryu@loywr.com

Kelly Kim, Esq. (SBN 286425)

kelly kim@loywr.com | Gianna N. Liddy, Esq. (SBN 316960) gianna.liddy@loywr.com

3130 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 402

Los Angeles, California 90010

Tel: (888) 365 — 8686

Fax: (800) 576 — 1170

Attorneys for Plaintiff

Superi 'f';"' or Court of Californ; ounty of Los Ange;flg;ma

DEC 20 2017

Sherr, . By [C’Gr k n Gomez Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

PEDRO GOMEZ, individually and on behalf of other individuals similarly situated, Plaintiff, V. S JOSEPH GREEN, an individual; GP MERGER SUB, INC., d.b.a. GlasPro, a Delaware Corporation; and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive,

Defendants.

BC687831

CASE NO.

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

MISSED REST BREAKS IN VIOLATION OF INDUSTRIAL WELFARE COMMISSION WAGE

ORDERS 4 AND CAL. LABOR CODE §§ 200, 226.7, AND 12 CCR § 11040;

MISSED 2ND MEAL BREAKS IN

VIOLATION OF CAL. LABOR CODE §§ 200, 226.7, 512, AND 12

CALIFORNIA CODE OF

REGULATIONS §11050;

FAILURE TO FURNISH AN . ACCURATE, ITEMIZED WAGE

STATEMENT UPON PAYMENT OF

WAGES IN VIOLATION OF CAL. LABOR CODE § 226;

FAILURE TO PAY COMPENSATION UPON TERMINATION OF EMPLOYMENT IN VIOLATION OF

CAL. LABOR CODE § 201-203; VIOLATIONS OF CAL. B&P CODE §§ 17200, ET SEQ.; AND

VIOLATION OF THE PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT

(“PAGA”) CAL. LABOR CODE SECTIONS 2699 et seq.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL