This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2023 at 06:32:39 (UTC).

PEDRO E. REYES GUTTIERREZ VS CHAMPION WINDOWS, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 PEDRO E REYES GUTTIERREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CHAMPION WINDOWS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE, YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS, KENNETH R. FREEMAN and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4197

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTTIERREZ PEDRO E. REYES

Defendant

CHAMPION WINDOWS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAWKINS JAMES R. ESQ.

CALVO MICHAEL J.

MAURO GREGORY ESTEBAN

Defendant Attorneys

GEORGGIN A. NICHOLAS

SPERLING STEVEN DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER (TO CONTINUE MAY 5, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/2/2023: Order - ORDER (TO CONTINUE MAY 5, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER (TO CONTINUE MAY 5, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/2/2023: Order - ORDER (TO CONTINUE MAY 5, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request - JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE MAY 5, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/28/2023: Request - JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE MAY 5, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF JANUARY 09, 2023 MINUTE ORDER

1/10/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF JANUARY 09, 2023 MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report

1/4/2023: Joint Status Conference Report

Joint Status Conference Report

9/12/2022: Joint Status Conference Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT; STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT; STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF 09/15/2022 MINUTE ORDER

9/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF 09/15/2022 MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT)

7/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT)

Joint Status Conference Report

7/13/2022: Joint Status Conference Report

Status Conference Report

10/1/2021: Status Conference Report

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT STATUS CONFERENCE

10/8/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report

12/27/2021: Joint Status Conference Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report

3/30/2022: Joint Status Conference Report

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • Hearing08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 05/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/07/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketOrder (to Continue May 5, 2023 Case Management Conference); Signed and Filed by: Pedro E. Reyes Guttierrez (Plaintiff); As to: Champion Windows, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order (to Continue May 5, 2023 Case Management Conference): Filed By: Pedro E. Reyes Guttierrez (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketJoint Request to Continue the May 5, 2023 Case Management Conference; Filed by: Pedro E. Reyes Guttierrez (Plaintiff); Champion Windows, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 05/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of January 09, 2023 Minute Order; Filed by: Pedro E. Reyes Guttierrez (Plaintiff); As to: Champion Windows, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to Complex Litigation Court) of 04/27/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 9 - Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to Complex Litigation Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- James R. Hawkins, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketAddress for James R. Hawkins, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pedro E. Reyes Guttierrez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pedro E. Reyes Guttierrez (Plaintiff); As to: Champion Windows, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pedro E. Reyes Guttierrez (Plaintiff); As to: Champion Windows, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less