This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 19:39:10 (UTC).

PEDRO CHAVARIN, ET AL. VS TAYLOR MACHINE WORKS, INC. A MISSISSIPPI CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 PEDRO CHAVARIN, filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against TAYLOR MACHINE WORKS, INC A MISSISSIPPI CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK C. KIM, WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT, DEIRDRE HILL and MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6419

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK C. KIM

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

DEIRDRE HILL

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAVARIN PEDRO

CHAVARIN MARIA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CAL-LIFT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS INC. A TENNESSEE CORPORATION

AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES A SINGAPORE CORPORATION

PACIFIC MARITIME ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GLOBAL MINING PRODUCTS INC A NEVADA CORPORATION

RIMEX USA AN ARIZONA BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN ORIGIN

EQT INFRASTRUCTURE III A SWEDEN CORPORATION

P5 INFRASTRUCTURE LLC. AN ARIZONA CORPORATION

TITAN INTERNATIONAL INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

TAYLOR MACHINE WORKS INC. A MISSISSIPPI CORPORATION

OTR WHEEL ENGINEERING INC. A GEORGIA CORPORATION

CMA/CGM A FRENCH CORPORATION

CRANE CERTIFICATION SERVICES INC.

PARKHOUSE TIRE INC.

AMERAMEX INTERNATIONAL INC. DBA HAMRE EQUIPMENT CO. A NEVADA CORPORATION

TITAN WHEEL CORPORATION OF ILLINOIS

BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS TIRE OPERATIONS LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

PARKHOUSE TIRE INC.

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSTON THOMAS J

MULDOON PATRICK

Defendant Attorneys

LARSON ARNOLD

MARSHALL MATTHEW

SCHWARTZ DOUGLAS ROBERT

JOHNSON THOMAS

VELILLA RACHEL T.

VICK JONATHAN S

KASS DENNIS B

KIM JESSICA SOO

BROWER FRANCES

HARRIS CHARLES LANE

LIGHTFOOT MARY P.

SARABEKIAN SETA

SCHRADER DANIEL P.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

PICKARD ASHLEY E.

REINECKE PETRA MARTINA

 

Court Documents

Association of Attorney

1/19/2023: Association of Attorney

Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT AMERAMEX INTERNATIONAL, INC. DBA HAMRE EQUIPMENTS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/13/2023: Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT AMERAMEX INTERNATIONAL, INC. DBA HAMRE EQUIPMENTS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - DEFENDANT AMERAMEX INTERNATIONAL, INC. DBA HAMRE EQUIPMENTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

1/13/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT AMERAMEX INTERNATIONAL, INC. DBA HAMRE EQUIPMENTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TIT AN INTERNATIONAL, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

12/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TIT AN INTERNATIONAL, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TITAN INTERNATIONAL, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE

12/27/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TITAN INTERNATIONAL, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

10/20/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

9/27/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/26/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/26/2022

9/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/26/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/21/2022

9/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/21/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

9/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/6/2022: Case Management Statement

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT AMERAMEX INTERNATIONAL, INC. DBA HAMRE EQUIPMENTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Filed by: AmeraMex International, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Pedro Chavarin (Plaintiff); Maria Chavarin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT AMERAMEX INTERNATIONAL, INC. DBA HAMRE EQUIPMENTS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Filed by: AmeraMex International, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TIT AN INTERNATIONAL, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Filed by: Titan International Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Defendant); Titan Wheel Corporation of Illinois (Defendant); As to: Maria Chavarin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Pedro Chavarin, et al. on 05/07/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Titan International Inc., an Illinois Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Dismissal of Defendant Titan International, Inc., Without Prejudice; Signed and Filed by: Titan International Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Defendant); As to: Pedro Chavarin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Dismissal of Defendant Titan International, Inc., Without Prejudice: Filed By: Titan International Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 11/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Taylor Machine Works, Inc. a Mississippi corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Pedro Chavarin, et al. on 05/07/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Pedro Chavarin and Maria Chavarin as to AmeraMex International, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
128 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Pedro Chavarin (Plaintiff); Maria Chavarin (Plaintiff); As to: Taylor Machine Works, Inc. a Mississippi corporation (Defendant); Cal-lift, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Titan International Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pedro Chavarin (Plaintiff); Maria Chavarin (Plaintiff); As to: Taylor Machine Works, Inc. a Mississippi corporation (Defendant); Cal-lift, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Titan International Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pedro Chavarin (Plaintiff); Maria Chavarin (Plaintiff); As to: Taylor Machine Works, Inc. a Mississippi corporation (Defendant); Cal-lift, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Titan International Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pedro Chavarin (Plaintiff); Maria Chavarin (Plaintiff); As to: Taylor Machine Works, Inc. a Mississippi corporation (Defendant); Cal-lift, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Titan International Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pedro Chavarin (Plaintiff); Maria Chavarin (Plaintiff); As to: Taylor Machine Works, Inc. a Mississippi corporation (Defendant); Cal-lift, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Titan International Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERAMEX INTERNATIONAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CRANE CERTIFICATION SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Taylor Machine Works, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where OTR Wheel Engineering, Inc. is a litigant