This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2021 at 03:06:12 (UTC).

PEDRAM SHAHABADI VS JOSE SEBASTIAN SEGOVIA GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 PEDRAM SHAHABADI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE SEBASTIAN SEGOVIA GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9898

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAHABADI PEDRAM

Defendant

SEGOVIA GUTIERREZ JOSE SEBASTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHEGINI MITRA

Defendant Attorneys

HANFF ROBERT ATLEE

ZENG BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

Association of Attorney

8/7/2020: Association of Attorney

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/13/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Request for Dismissal

8/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

8/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

Answer

3/23/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/20/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/11/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Pedram Shahabadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion (TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND DEMAND FOR PRUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; FOR IMPOSITION OF SANCTION OF $1,823.30;); Filed by Pedram Shahabadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Jose Sebastian Segovia Gutierrez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jose Sebastian Segovia Gutierrez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pedram Shahabadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pedram Shahabadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pedram Shahabadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STCV09898 Hearing Date: August 17, 2021 Dept: 27

\r\n\r\n

SUPERIOR\r\nCOURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

\r\n\r\n

FOR\r\nTHE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n\r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n
\r\n

PEDRAM SHAHABADI,\r\n

\r\n

Plaintiff(s),

\r\n

vs.

\r\n

\r\n

JOSE SEBASTIAN SEGOVIA GUTIERREZ, et al.,

\r\n

\r\n

Defendant(s).

\r\n
\r\n

)

\r\n

)

\r\n

)

\r\n

)

\r\n

)

\r\n

)

\r\n

)

\r\n

)

\r\n

)

\r\n

)

\r\n

)

\r\n

)\r\n )

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n CASE NO.: 20STCV09898

\r\n

\r\n

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION\r\n TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

\r\n

\r\n

Dept. 27

\r\n

8:30 a.m.

\r\n

August 17, 2021

\r\n
\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On\r\nMarch 11, 2020, plaintiff Pedram Shahabadi (“Plaintiff”) filed this action\r\nagainst defendant Jose Sebastian Segovia Gutierrez (“Defendant”) arising from a\r\nJune 12, 2019 motor vehicle accident.

\r\n\r\n

On\r\nJuly 14, 2020, Plaintiff served Form Interrogatories (Set One) and Demand for\r\nProduction and Inspection of Documents (Set One) on Defendant. (Chegini Decl., Ex. A.) The proof of service reflects that the\r\ndiscovery was served by mail to the address on the caption page of Defendant’s\r\nanswer. (Ibid.) On August 7, 2020, Defendant filed an\r\nassociation of attorney identifying another attorney and email address to use\r\nfor service. (Id., Ex. B.) No responses were received. (Id., ¶ 4.) On April 22, 2021, Plaintiff’s counsel\r\ncontacted defense counsel requesting responses and emailed the requests to the email\r\naddress provided by defense counsel,\r\ntiffany.bartley@southweststaffcounsel.com. \r\n(Id., ¶ 5.) On June 1,\r\n2021, Plaintiff’s counsel sent a meet and confer letter requesting responses\r\nwithin 10 days. (Id., Ex. D.) On June 23, 2021, defense counsel called\r\nPlaintiff’s counsel and stated that responses would be served by June 26, 2021.\r\n (Id., ¶ 6.) On June 30, 2021, Plaintiff sent defense\r\ncounsel an email advising that if responses were not received by July 7, 2021,\r\nmotion practice would follow. (Id.,\r\nEx. E.) Defendant still did not serve responses. (Id., ¶ 7.) Plaintiff filed these motions on July 13,\r\n2021.

\r\n\r\n

Where\r\na party fails to serve timely responses to discovery requests, the court may\r\nmake an order compelling responses. \r\n(Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300; Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007)\r\n148 Cal.App.4th 390, 403.)

\r\n\r\n

Defendant\r\ndid not oppose the motions and it is undisputed responses were not served. However, Plaintiff filed one motion to compel\r\nresponses to two sets of discovery instead of filing one motion for each set of\r\ndiscovery responses sought to be compelled. \r\nTherefore, Plaintiff’s motion is GRANTED on the condition that Plaintiff\r\npays an additional filing fee and files proof of payment within 20 days. Defendant is ordered to serve verified\r\nresponses without objections to Plaintiff’s Form Interrogatories (Set One) and Demand\r\nfor Production and Inspection of Documents (Set One) within 20 days of the date\r\nPlaintiff files proof of payment of the additional filing fee.

\r\n\r\n

Where\r\nthe court grants a motion to compel responses, sanctions shall be imposed\r\nagainst the party who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel,\r\nunless the party acted with substantial justification or the sanction would\r\notherwise be unjust. (Code Civ. Proc., §\r\n2030.290, subd. (c), 2031.300, subd. (c).) \r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff’s\r\nrequest for monetary sanctions is GRANTED on the condition stated above and\r\nimposed against Plaintiff and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the\r\nreduced amount of $548.30 for 1 hours at Plaintiff’s counsel’s hourly rate of $425.00\r\nand $123.30 in filing fees, to be paid within 20 days of the date Plaintiff files\r\nproof of payment of the additional filing fee.

\r\n\r\n

Moving\r\nparty to give notice.

\r\n\r\n

Parties\r\nwho intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org\r\nindicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions\r\nprovided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.

\r\n\r\n'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANFF ROBERT ATLEE