This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 00:50:15 (UTC).

PEDRAM SALIMPOUR VS VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 PEDRAM SALIMPOUR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0761

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALIMPOUR PEDRAM

Defendants

EDALAT PAUL P. DBA SENTAR PHARMACEUTICALS

VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. A CORPORATION DBA SENTAR PHARMACEUTICALS

KARPINSKI OLIVIA

VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. DBA SENTAR PHARMACEUTICALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIRARDI THOMAS V

GRIFFIN KEITH D.

MOAVEN DUSTIN Z.

Defendant Attorney

BRYNER CANDICE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

12/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Notice of Related Case

10/8/2021: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

12/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 12/09/2021

12/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 12/09/2021

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/6/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

11/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Related Case

10/8/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/5/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/18/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT PACKAGE)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT PACKAGE)

Order - ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/15/2021: Order - ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT PACKAGE)

7/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT PACKAGE)

Association of Attorney

6/24/2021: Association of Attorney

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • Hearing03/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Hearing and Order); Filed by Pedram Salimpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:24 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Case;) of 12/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Vivera Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant); Paul P. Edalat (Defendant); Olivia Karpinski (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pedram Salimpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Vivera Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant); Paul P. Edalat (Defendant); Olivia Karpinski (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Pedram Salimpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Pedram Salimpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Pedram Salimpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDisassociation of Attorney; Filed by Pedram Salimpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF NO LIEN DUE TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL); Filed by Pedram Salimpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pedram Salimpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pedram Salimpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pedram Salimpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STCV40761 Hearing Date: July 15, 2021 Dept: 50

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Superior Court of California

\r\n\r\n

County of Los Angeles

\r\n\r\n

Department\r\n50

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n\r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n
\r\n

pedram salimpour,

\r\n

Plaintiff,

\r\n

vs.

\r\n

vivera pharmaceuticals, inc., et al.,

\r\n

Defendants.

\r\n
\r\n

Case No.:

\r\n
\r\n

20STCV40761

\r\n
\r\n

Hearing Date:

\r\n
\r\n

July 15, 2021

\r\n
\r\n

Hearing Time:

\r\n
\r\n

10:00 a.m.

\r\n
\r\n

[TENTATIVE] ORDER\r\n RE:

\r\n

\r\n

PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

\r\n

\r\n
\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff\r\nPedram Salimpour (“Plaintiff”) requests entry of default judgment against Defendants\r\nVivera Pharmaceuticals, Inc. dba Sentar Pharmaceuticals, Paul P. Edalat dba\r\nSentar Pharmaceuticals, and Olivia Karpinski (collectively, “Defendants”). Plaintiff\r\nseeks judgment in the total amount of $8,600,657.81, comprising $8,350,000 in\r\ndamages, $657.81 in costs, and $250,000 in attorney fees.

\r\n\r\n

The\r\nCourt notes a number of defects with the submitted default judgment package.

\r\n\r\n

First, the damages sought in the request for\r\ndefault judgment exceed the damages as prayed for in the Complaint (indeed, the\r\nComplaint contains no damages allegations at all). “A complaint . . . shall\r\ncontain . . . the following: . . . . (2) A demand for judgment for the relief to\r\nwhich the pleader claims to be entitled. \r\nIf the recovery of money or damages is demanded, the amount demanded\r\nshall be stated.” ((Code Civ. Proc., § 425.10, subd. (a).)\r\nCode of Civil Procedure section 580, subdivision (a)\r\n“limits a trial court’s jurisdiction to grant relief on a default judgment to\r\nthe amount stated in the complaint.” ((Dhawan v. Biring (2015) 241 Cal.App.4th\r\n963, 968.) “[I]n all default judgments the demand sets a ceiling on\r\nrecovery.” ((Finney\r\nv. Gomez (2003) 111 Cal.App.4th 527, 534.)

\r\n\r\n

Second, Plaintiff has not provided sufficient\r\nevidentiary support for the compensatory damages requested. (See Salimpour\r\nDecl., ¶ 45 [general reference to “financial losses” suffered].) Plaintiff has\r\nalso failed to provide sufficient evidence to support his request for emotional\r\ndistress damages. ((See\r\nDuarte v. Zachariah (1994) 22 Cal.App.4th 1652, 1664-1665 [the standard for\r\ndetermining compensation for pain and suffering is based on what a reasonable\r\nperson would estimate as fair compensation].)

\r\n\r\n

Third, Plaintiff has not sought to dismiss doe defendants. A party seeking\r\na default judgment must file “[a] dismissal of all parties against whom\r\njudgment is not sought or an application for separate judgment against\r\nspecified parties under Code of Civil Procedure section\r\n579, supported by a showing of grounds for each judgment . . . .” ((Cal. Rules of\r\nCourt, rule 3.1800(a)(7).)

\r\n\r\n

Fourth, Plaintiff’s request for attorney’s\r\nfees does not comply with California Rules of Court,\r\nrule 3.1800(b) and Los Angeles Superior Court Local Rule\r\n3.214(a). Plaintiff seeks an award of attorney’s fees in excess of the\r\nschedule set forth in Local Rule 3.214(a).

\r\n\r\n

Fifth, Plaintiff’s memorandum of costs (item 7\r\nof the Request for Entry of Default) includes a total ($1,108.61) does not\r\nmatch the costs set forth in the proposed judgment ($657.81). Moreover,\r\nPlaintiff has not provided any authority for the costs that are not allowable\r\nunder Code of Civil Procedure section 1033.5 (e.g.,\r\nunspecified “other” costs totaling $261.10).

\r\n\r\n

Accordingly,\r\nthe Court denies Plaintiff’s request for default judgment without prejudice. The\r\nClerk will discuss with Plaintiff a schedule for resubmission of the default\r\njudgment package.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

DATED: July 15, 2021 ________________________________

\r\n\r\n

Hon.\r\nTeresa A. Beaudet

\r\n\r\n

Judge,\r\nLos Angeles Superior Court

\r\n\r\n

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. A CORPORATION DBA SENTAR PHARMACEUTICALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOAVEN DUSTIN Z.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIFFIN KEITH D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIRARDI THOMAS V.