This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2021 at 23:25:21 (UTC).

PEARL RIVERA VS EMPLOYBRIDGE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 PEARL RIVERA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against EMPLOYBRIDGE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DALILA CORRAL LYONS, RICHARD L. FRUIN, DAVID J. COWAN and KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3177

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

RICHARD L. FRUIN

DAVID J. COWAN

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERA PEARL

Defendants

EMPLOYBRIDGE LLC DBA SELECT STAFFING

EMPLOYMENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS INC.

EMPLOYMENT SOLUTIONS MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOOD MORGAN JAMES

GOOD MORGAN J.

Defendant Attorney

KUN MICHAEL S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLETE BIN...)

11/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLETE BIN...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE OSC RE DISMISSAL; ORDER

11/30/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE OSC RE DISMISSAL; ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS AND STAY ACTION

11/12/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS AND STAY ACTION

Notice of Ruling

11/18/2019: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

11/12/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

10/4/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/26/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) AGAINST THE HONORABLE DALILA CORRAL LYONS - DEPARTMENT 20

7/15/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) AGAINST THE HONORABLE DALILA CORRAL LYONS - DEPARTMENT 20

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFI...)

7/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER - REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFI...) OF 07/16/2019

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER - REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFI...) OF 07/16/2019

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

7/16/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/24/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Complete Binding Arbitration Timely) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Entire action/complaint - with prejudice); Filed by Pearl Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Complete Binding Arbitration Timely) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Complete Bin...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue OSC Re Dismissal; Order); Filed by Employbridge LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Employbridge LLC (Defendant); Employment Solutions Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Employbridge LLC (Defendant); Employment Solutions Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS AND STAY ACTION); Filed by Employbridge LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pearl Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:57 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER - REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFI...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER - REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFI...) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (against the Honorable Dalila Corral Lyons - Department 20); Filed by Pearl Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pearl Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pearl Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pearl Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMPLOYMENT SOLUTIONS MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPLOYBRIDGE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOOD MORGAN JAMES