This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2020 at 01:38:03 (UTC).

PEARL OF THE EAST RTC, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS MERRY LAND INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 PEARL OF THE EAST RTC, L P , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MERRY LAND INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2204

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEARL OF THE EAST RTC L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

LI KELLY JIE

MERRY LAND INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HSU ROGER C.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

10/14/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/25/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/12/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/12/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pearl of the East RTC, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pearl of the East RTC, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pearl of the East RTC, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pearl of the East RTC, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HSU ROGER C.