This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2020 at 05:22:33 (UTC).

PCM SALES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SCAN-OPTICS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 PCM SALES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCAN-OPTICS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6386

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PCM SALES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

SCAN-OPTICS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALEN JEFFREY MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

NOWLAND THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/21/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

6/28/2019: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/16/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

5/14/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/10/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/10/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • Hearing10/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Hearing10/09/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Hearing07/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SCAN-OPTICS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SCAN-OPTICS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCM SALES INC. is a litigant