This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 18:11:43 (UTC).

PAZ DE LA HUERTA VS HARVEY WEINSTEIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 PAZ DE LA HUERTA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HARVEY WEINSTEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0894

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUERTA PAZ DE LA

Defendants

MICHAEL D. EISNER IN HIS CAPACITY AS AN OFFICER AND DIRECTOR OF THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY D.

THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY

FOUR SEASONS HOTEL LTD A CANADIAN CORPORATION

ROBERT A. IGER IN HIS CAPACITY AS AN OFFICER AND DIRECTOR OF THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY

ROBERT WEINSTEIN IN HIS CAPACITY AS AN OFFICER AND DIRECTOR OF MIRAMAX AND OF THE WEINSTEIN COMPANY LLC AND OF MIRAMAX

WEINSTEIN HARVEY AN INDIVIDUAL

BURTON WAY HOTELS LLC A DELAWARE LLC

BURTON WAY HOTELS LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MIRAMAX FILM NY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FILLER AARON GERSHON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/27/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/27/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/3/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL) OF 09/10/2019

9/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL) OF 09/10/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL)

9/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

9/5/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AARON G. FILLER, ESQ. AS TO EXHIBITS A THROUGH F FILED IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT AND EXHIBIT A THROUGH F

9/3/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AARON G. FILLER, ESQ. AS TO EXHIBITS A THROUGH F FILED IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT AND EXHIBIT A THROUGH F

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/14/2020

1/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/14/2020

Order - Dismissal

1/14/2020: Order - Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of 01/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docketat 10:46 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Removal to Federal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Removal to Federal) of 09/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Miramax Film NY LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF AARON G. FILLER, ESQ. AS TO EXHIBITS A THROUGH F FILED IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT AND EXHIBIT A THROUGH F); Filed by Paz de la Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paz de la Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paz de la Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Paz de la Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paz de la Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miramax Film NY LLC f/k/a Miramax Film Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Four Seasons Hotels Limited Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BURTON WAY HOTELS LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WALT DISNEY COMPANY THE is a litigant