This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 04:51:13 (UTC).

PAZ DE LA HUERTA VS HARVEY WEINSTEIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 PAZ DE LA HUERTA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HARVEY WEINSTEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4723

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LA HUERTA PAZ

Defendants

BURTON WAY HOTELS LLC

THE WEINSTEIN COMPANY

BURTON WAY HOTELS LTD

FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LTD

WEINSTEIN HARVEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FILLER AARON GERSHON

Defendant Attorney

SCHRIEFFER PAUL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/29/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service - No Service

12/14/2018: Proof of Service - No Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

3/22/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/17/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amended Complaint

2/19/2019: Amended Complaint

Notice

2/5/2019: Notice

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike

1/10/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike

Declaration

1/10/2019: Declaration

Proof of Service - No Service

12/14/2018: Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal

12/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/12/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration

12/12/2018: Declaration

Proof of Service by Mail

12/12/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/12/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/12/2018: Proof of Personal Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Paz De La Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Four Seasons Hotels, LTD (Defendant); Burton Way Hotels LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (Demurrer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Amended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by Paz De La Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Notice (Off Calendar Notice of Demurrer and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Four Seasons Hotels, LTD (Defendant); Burton Way Hotels, LTD (Defendant); Burton Way Hotels LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Declaration of Paul K. Schriefer in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Filed by Four Seasons Hotels, LTD (Defendant); Burton Way Hotels, LTD (Defendant); Burton Way Hotels LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Four Seasons Hotels, LTD (Defendant); Burton Way Hotels, LTD (Defendant); Burton Way Hotels LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by Four Seasons Hotels, LTD (Defendant); Burton Way Hotels, LTD (Defendant); Burton Way Hotels LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Four Seasons Hotels, LTD (Defendant); Burton Way Hotels, LTD (Defendant); Burton Way Hotels LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Paz De La Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Declaration (of Diligence); Filed by Paz De La Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Paz De La Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Paz De La Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Paz De La Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Paz De La Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Paz De La Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paz De La Huerta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Four Seasons Hotels Limited Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where The Weinstein Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BURTON WAY HOTELS LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FILLER AARON G.