This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2023 at 10:10:45 (UTC).

PAVEMENT RECYCLING SYSTEMS, INC. VS FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 PAVEMENT RECYCLING SYSTEMS, INC filed an Other lawsuit against FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0183

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAVEMENT RECYCLING SYSTEMS INC.

Defendants

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION A CORPORATION DBA SHAWNAN

VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISSMAN ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

BEAUMONT NANETTE M

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

5/16/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/11/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

3/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND DISCOVERY AND MOTION CUT OFF DATES

2/16/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND DISCOVERY AND MOTION CUT OFF DATES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

12/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/9/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON ...)

7/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON ...)

Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

7/19/2022: Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DISCOVERY DEADLINES

7/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DISCOVERY DEADLINES

Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DISCOVERY DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THERE

7/18/2022: Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DISCOVERY DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THERE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF J. BRENT RICHARDSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DISCOVERY DEADLINES

7/18/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF J. BRENT RICHARDSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DISCOVERY DEADLINES

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

7/18/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

7/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NANETTE BEAUMONT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DISCOVERY DEADLINES

7/18/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NANETTE BEAUMONT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DISCOVERY DEADLINES

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

7/18/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATIONS OF NANETTE BEAUMONT AND J. BRENT RICHARDSON IN SUPPORT

7/18/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATIONS OF NANETTE BEAUMONT AND J. BRENT RICHARDSON IN SUPPORT

Case Management Statement

7/5/2022: Case Management Statement

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • Hearing08/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department K at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • Hearing08/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department K at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department K - Hon. Peter A. Hernandezeffective 05/22/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Pavement Recycling Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Pavement Recycling Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff); Federal Insurance Company, a Corporation (Defendant); Vigilant Insurance Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- 08/15/2023 Final Status Conference: Location changed from Department L to Department K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- 08/29/2023 Non-Jury Trial (time estimate: 1 day): Location changed from Department L to Department K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department L - Hon. Wesley L. Hsueffective 03/02/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Pavement Recycling Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Pavement Recycling Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff); Federal Insurance Company, a Corporation (Defendant); Vigilant Insurance Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Pavement Recycling Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Sialic Contractors Corporation, A Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pavement Recycling Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Federal Insurance Company, a Corporation (Defendant); Vigilant Insurance Company (Defendant); Sialic Contractors Corporation, A Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pavement Recycling Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Federal Insurance Company, a Corporation (Defendant); Vigilant Insurance Company (Defendant); Sialic Contractors Corporation, A Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pavement Recycling Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Federal Insurance Company, a Corporation (Defendant); Vigilant Insurance Company (Defendant); Sialic Contractors Corporation, A Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less