This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 01:34:58 (UTC).

PAULO MATOSO VS JAMES RIVER MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC., DBA JAMES RIVER INSURANCE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 PAULO MATOSO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMES RIVER MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC , DBA JAMES RIVER INSURANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9691

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATOSO PAULO

Defendants

JAMES RIVER MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC. DBA JAMES RIVER INSURANCE

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN REONNA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2024
  • Hearing06/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2023
  • Hearing12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2023
  • Hearing11/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paulo Matoso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Paulo Matoso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paulo Matoso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMES RIVER MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN REONNA