This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 02:46:42 (UTC).

PAULINA CASTELLO VS BURKE STREET FEE OWNER, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 PAULINA CASTELLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURKE STREET FEE OWNER, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7726

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTELLO PAULINA

Defendants

FPI MANAGEMENT INC.

BURKE STREET FEE OWNER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMIN PARAG L.

Defendant Attorney

FOSTER DANIEL J.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/25/2020: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/10/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF JOINT CONSENT TO E-SERVICE

4/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF JOINT CONSENT TO E-SERVICE

Answer

4/8/2020: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/21/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

4/21/2020: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TILLES RE MEET AND CONFER

4/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TILLES RE MEET AND CONFER

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

7/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND FSC

7/15/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND FSC

Disassociation of Attorney

6/16/2021: Disassociation of Attorney

Association of Attorney

10/26/2020: Association of Attorney

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • Hearing02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Hearing01/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order); Filed by FPI Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial Date and FSC); Filed by FPI Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDisassociation of Attorney; Filed by Burke Street Fee Owner, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Burke Street Fee Owner, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FPI Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Joint Consent to E-Service); Filed by Paulina Castello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Paulina Castello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Paulina Castello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Paulina Castello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paulina Castello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paulina Castello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURKE STREET FEE OWNER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIN PARAG L.