This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:49:09 (UTC).

PAULA THOMAS VS DAVID SCHNIDER ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 PAULA THOMAS filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against DAVID SCHNIDER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG, DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB, SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON, BARBARA M. SCHEPER and MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9247

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

THOMAS PAULA

TW HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

NOLAN HEILMAN LLC

BOOTH LAURA

KENNETH W. CHUNG

SCHNIDER DAVID

THOMPSON ALLYSON K

HESS LAURA C.

KRING & CHUNG LLC

THE LAW OFFICES FO DAVID SCHNIDER

CHUNG KENNETH W.

LAW STUDIOS/RICHARD BRYON PEDDIE PC

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

THOMPSON ALLYSON K.

PEDDIE RICHARD

THE LAW OFFICES OF DAVID SCHNIDER

BAE YOONSUNG

PARK JENE

FOSTER JOSEPH

CHUNG KENNETH W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BILLER DIMITRIOS P. ESQ.

DALEY & SACKS LAW RLLP

LDT CONSULTING INC.

DALEY MARCIA LORENA

BILLER DIMITRIOS PETER

Defendant Attorneys

BRUTZKUS GUBNER ROZANSKY SEROR WEBER

KAUFMAN DOLOWICH & VOLUCK LLP

WANG STEVEN S.

OLSON GLEN R.

PARKER DAVID BRUCE ESQ.

OLSON GLEN ROBERT

WRIGHT JOHN ANDREW

SILVER ROBERT S.

PEDDIE RICHARD BYRON

BROGAN KEVIN HERBERT

SILVER ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

1/5/2018: Legacy Document

DEFENDANTS RICHARD PEDDIE AND LAWSTUDIOS/RICHARD BYRON PEDDIE, P.C.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DIMITRIOS P. BILLER SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIK

6/29/2018: DEFENDANTS RICHARD PEDDIE AND LAWSTUDIOS/RICHARD BYRON PEDDIE, P.C.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DIMITRIOS P. BILLER SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIK

PLAINTIFF PAULA THOMAS' OPPOSITION TO THE DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANTS (1) DAVID SCHNIDER, (2) LAW OFFICE OF DAVID SCIINIDER, AND (3) NOLAN HEILMAN, LLC

8/15/2018: PLAINTIFF PAULA THOMAS' OPPOSITION TO THE DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANTS (1) DAVID SCHNIDER, (2) LAW OFFICE OF DAVID SCIINIDER, AND (3) NOLAN HEILMAN, LLC

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/28/2018: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

12/3/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Response

12/3/2018: Response

Case Management Statement

1/9/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/28/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order

2/28/2019: Minute Order

Opposition

2/28/2019: Opposition

Order

3/1/2019: Order

Notice

3/12/2019: Notice

Case Management Statement

3/15/2019: Case Management Statement

Ex Parte Application

3/21/2019: Ex Parte Application

Case Management Statement

4/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

4/25/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/8/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF PAULA THOMAS? OPPOSITION TO THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE THAT DEFENDANT RICHARD PEDDIE FILED ON JANUARY 4, 2017

1/10/2018: PLAINTIFF PAULA THOMAS? OPPOSITION TO THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE THAT DEFENDANT RICHARD PEDDIE FILED ON JANUARY 4, 2017

264 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Nolan Heilman, LLC (Defendant); David Schnider (Defendant); The Law Offices of David Schnider (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Richard Peddie (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Paula Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion for an Order for Preliminary Mandatory Injunction)

    Read MoreRead Less
428 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF PAULA THOMAS' NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF PAULA THOMAS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Paula Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Paula Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paula Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Paula Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC679247    Hearing Date: June 30, 2020    Dept: 30

Dept. 30

Calendar No.

Thomas vs. Schnider, et.al, Case No. BC679247

Tentative Ruling re: Plaintiff’s Motion to Vacate

Plaintiff moves to vacate the Court’s order granting attorney’s fees in favor of Defendants Richard Peddie and Law Studios/Richard Peddie pursuant to Code Civ. Proc. § 473. The motion is denied. First, since Plaintiff has filed an appeal of this order, this Court lacks jurisdiction to entertain the motion pursuant to CCP Section 916. Further, as best the Court can understand Plaintiff’s motion, it appears to be based on the erroneous belief that this Court did not address Plaintiff’s evidentiary objections filed in connection with the motion for attorney’s fees. The Court in fact ruled on Plaintiff’s objections and filed and served that order along with the ruling on the fee motion on November 12, 2019.