This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2023 at 10:51:09 (UTC).

PAULA ROGERS VS HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 PAULA ROGERS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0337

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROGERS PAULA

Defendant

HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUNCH BRUCE MONROE

Defendant Attorney

WERRE GREGORY D.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/6/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/6/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/6/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/6/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/6/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/12/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/18/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

5/5/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

5/5/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/5/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2023
  • Hearing08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F51 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital (Defendant); As to: Paula Rogers (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Paula Rogers (Plaintiff); As to: Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/14/2023; Service Cost: 109.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F51 - Hon. Andrew E. Coopereffective 04/17/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Paula Rogers (Plaintiff); As to: Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Paula Rogers (Plaintiff); As to: Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Paula Rogers (Plaintiff); As to: Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F51 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less