This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 01:48:35 (UTC).

PAULA RAND VS OLYMPIA HEALTH CARE, LLC.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 PAULA RAND filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against OLYMPIA HEALTH CARE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0700

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAND PAULA

Defendants

OLYMPIA HEALTH CARE LLC.

ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LYON DEVON

LYON DEVON M

Defendant Attorney

STOCKUNAS LAUREN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

9/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

9/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/09/2021

9/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/09/2021

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

8/13/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Answer - ANSWER ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/13/2021: Answer - ANSWER ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL CORRESPONDING DEADLINES

8/13/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL CORRESPONDING DEADLINES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 08/16/2021

8/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 08/16/2021

Order - Dismissal

8/16/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND AL...)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND AL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND AL...)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND AL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND AL...) OF 08/16/2021

8/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND AL...) OF 08/16/2021

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/3/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/15/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/17/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Paula Rand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 09/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Paula Rand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date and All Corresponding Deadlines) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date and Al...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Paula Rand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference Hearing); Filed by Paula Rand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer (AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT OLYMPIA HEALTH CARE, LLC TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT); Filed by Olympia Health Care, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Paula Rand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paula Rand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paula Rand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Paula Rand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paula Rand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OLYMPIA HEALTH CARE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOCKUNAS LAUREN