This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 23:01:45 (UTC).

PAULA HOFSOMMER VS. BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING, INC

Case Summary

On 04/14/2017 PAULA HOFSOMMER filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN P. PFAHLER and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7694

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOFSOMMER PAULA

Defendants

BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC

BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES INC

BROOKDALE CHATSWORTH COMCARE HOME HEALTH

BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING SOLUTIONS

COMCARE HEALTH INC.

CHARTIY ATIIM LVN (DOE 131)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEBLER GARY L.

Defendant Attorneys

BEACH|COWDREY|JENKINS LLP

BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNEIDER&LOWARY LLP

CLARK HILL LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Motion

7/12/2018: Notice of Motion

Declaration

7/12/2018: Declaration

Request for Judicial Notice

7/12/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Summary Judgment

7/12/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment

Request for Judicial Notice

7/12/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

7/12/2018: Declaration

Request for Judicial Notice

7/12/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Lodging

7/12/2018: Notice of Lodging

Notice of Lodging

7/12/2018: Notice of Lodging

Motion for Summary Adjudication

7/13/2018: Motion for Summary Adjudication

Motion for Summary Adjudication

7/13/2018: Motion for Summary Adjudication

Notice of Motion

7/13/2018: Notice of Motion

Notice of Lodging

7/13/2018: Notice of Lodging

Request for Judicial Notice

7/13/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

7/13/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

7/13/2018: Declaration

Notice of Lodging

7/19/2018: Notice of Lodging

Request for Dismissal

8/17/2018: Request for Dismissal

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Notice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Notice of Lodging (OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT, COMCARE HOME HEALTH, INC. FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT COMCARE HOME HEALTH, INC. FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Mtn for Summary Adjud of Issues; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Declaration (OF MOLLY M. LOY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT, COMCARE HOME HEALTH, INC., FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Declaration (OF DAVINA LEARY, R.N., C.C.M., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CHARITY ATIIM L.V.N.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Notice of Lodging; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CHARITY ATIIM, LVN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Answer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory (PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO AND DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED JUDGE HON. MELVIN SANDVIG, PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Declaration (RE: REASONABLE DILIGENCE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PERSONALLY SERVED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Declaration (RE: MAILING ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2016
  • at 01:30 pm in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Case Reassigned for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEBLER GARY L. ESQ.